DE HB222 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Substitute Act incorporates House Bill No. 222, and also makes the following changes to House Bill No. 222:
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 10 And 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Lethal Violence Protection Orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-09 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 3 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Stricken in House | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Stricken in House | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 3 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-06 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-03 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 222, and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |