DE HB222 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-15)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-15)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill updates the eligibility requirements for interment in the Delaware Veterans Memorial Cemetery by referencing the National Cemetery Administration Directive. It additionally provides that members of the Guard or Reserve are eligible and allows the Veterans Commission to impose a residency requirement.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 20 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Eligibility For Burial In The Delaware Veterans Memorial Cemetery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (VETERANS AFFAIRS) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-22 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-03-22 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-03-16 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee (VETERANS AFFAIRS) in House with 1 Favorable, 15 On Its Merits |
2016-03-03 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-12-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House |