DE HB222 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill requires that the Department of Labor publish the names of employers who have violated the Workplace Fraud Act, by misclassifying an employee as an independent contractor or otherwise. Publication will be via the internet.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Relating To The Workplace Fraud Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. James Johnson [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] |
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-21 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-15 | Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate | |
2012-01-26 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-01-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-01-18 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-30 | Re-Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2011-06-28 | Introduced in House and assigned to Labor Committee | |
2011-06-28 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House |