DE HB222 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-12 - Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-12 - Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides that any periodic report that a State agency, board, committee and/or commission is required by law to report to the General Assembly may, alternatively, be provided to Members of the General Assembly in electronic format. This Act is very likely to result in significant cost-savings as well as significantly reduce the volume of materials that must be disposed of or recycled by State government.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Reports In Electronic Format To The Delaware General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-12 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2009-06-25 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-16 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |