DE HB220 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds coverage for Medication Assisted Treatment ("MAT") for drug and alcohol dependencies to the mental health parity laws for health insurance. This Act requires health insurance carriers to provide coverage for prescription medications approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration for MAT at no greater financial burden than for prescription medication for other illness or disease, without step therapy requirements, and at the lowest tier of the drug formulary.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Coverage For Drug And Alcohol Dependency And Medication Assisted Treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 2 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 220 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 220 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-25 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 220 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 220 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |