DE HB220 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This act establishes the Addiction Action Committee as a means to establish a comprehensive, coordinated strategy to address addiction in Delaware. The committee is authorized to make recommendations on a comprehensive approach to address and monitor the addiction crisis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Drug Abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-16 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-23 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2017-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2017-06-13 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback