DE HB219 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health, Children & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The 146th General Assembly gave the Department of Health and Social Services the authority to promulgate regulations and require accreditation for facilities that perform invasive medical procedures. The current terminology and definition of an invasive medical procedure has been frequently misinterpreted and caused a great deal of confusion in the medical community. This Act revises the current language to be consistent with terminology used by accreditation organizations and other states, replacing the term invasive medical procedure with the term office-based surgery. In addition, this Act clarifies the definition to ensure that all facilities that perform such procedures do so in a safe and sanitary environment. Finally, this Act adds a requirement that the approved accreditation organizations shall report, at a minimum, findings of surveys and complaint and incident investigations, and data for all office-based surgical facilities to the Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 And Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Invasive Medical Procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2018-05-08 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-05-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 219 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-16 Amendment HA 1 to HB 219 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-08 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback