DE HB218 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act modernizes fishing, hunting, and trapping license and associated waterfowl and trout stamp specifications to include digital formats. This Act refines the definition of waterfowl consistent with the gamebird waterfowl definition in existing code for determining when a waterfowl stamp is required to hunt waterfowl. This Act also eliminates trout catch reporting requirements, clarifies when and where a trout fishing stamp is required for fishing, and corrects certain trout stamp exemptions in the current code.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Hunting And Fishing Authorizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment & Energy) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-22 | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |