DE HB218 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - HS 1 for HB 218 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - HS 1 for HB 218 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill requires written authorization from a patient for any person to pick up a prescription on a patient’s behalf. Currently, a pharmacy is only required to obtain and keep on file valid photographic identification for the person picking up the prescription; there is no requirement that a pharmacy obtain written authorization from the patient before releasing a prescription to another person on the patient’s behalf.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Prescriptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 218 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 218 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-06-26 | House | HS 1 for HB 218 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-30 | House | HS 1 for HB 218 - Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2014-01-29 | House | HS 1 for HB 218 - Assigned to Health & Human Development |
2014-01-29 | House | Substituted by HS 1 for HB 218 |
2013-06-30 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to Health & Human Development Committee |
2013-06-30 | House | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |