DE HB216 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Under the Governors Eleventh Modification of the COVID-19 State of Emergency Declaration, and continuing upon passage of Senate Bill No. 247, remote notarization and witnessing by Delaware attorneys via audio-visual technology has been permitted. This provision is currently set to sunset on June 30, 2021. This Act extends the provision through June 30, 2022.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 20 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Notarization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-25 | Re-Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-22 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |