DE HB216 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This amendment to Section 8-200 of the Charter of the City of Wilmington raises some of the threshold amounts for bid requirements in the procurement process. The purpose of the amendment is to improve City of Wilmington procurement procedures, increase public access to City of Wilmington contracting opportunities through the authorization of internet advertising, and authorize the City of Wilmington to participate in cooperative purchasing agreements with other public procurement agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Home Rule Charter Of The City Of Wilmington Relating To Contracts And Procurement Requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-27 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-08 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback