DE HB216 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill eliminates the requirement that a person display a hunting or fishing license in a manner that is “plainly visible” as long as the person possesses the license on their person.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Hunting, Trapping & Fishing Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-01-12 | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate | |
2009-06-18 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-10 | Introduced in House and assigned to Natural Resources Committee | |
2009-06-10 | Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |