DE HB215 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill eliminates the sunset provision on the at-store recycling program for plastic bags. The program established in 2009 included a sunset provision until 2014. In 2014, the General Assembly extended that sunset provision to 2017. This bill eliminates the sunset provision permanently to encourage the continued routine for consumers to recycle plastic bags through at-store programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Recycling And Waste Reduction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-23 Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
2017-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-06 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback