DE HB215 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill eliminates the sunset provision on the at-store recycling program for plastic bags. The program established in 2009 included a sunset provision until 2014. In 2014, the General Assembly extended that sunset provision to 2017. This bill eliminates the sunset provision permanently to encourage the continued routine for consumers to recycle plastic bags through at-store programs.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Recycling And Waste Reduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2017-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-23 | Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-06 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |