DE HB214 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends merit compensation bargaining unit by allowing non-uniformed correctional employees, including correctional counselors, correctional administrative staff and similar occupations, to bargain over compensation. These correctional employees are presently the only correctional employees excluded from compensation bargaining.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Collective Bargaining For State Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 6 NO 1 NOT VOTING | |
2017-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-23 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 214 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 214 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |