DE HB214 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Currently, for an assault to rise to the level of assault in the second degree against a nurse, the nurse must be rendering emergency care. This bill includes an assault on a nurse performing a work-related duty as a second degree assault.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2016-05-10 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 1 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-10 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-05-10 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-30 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee |
2015-06-30 | House | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |