DE HB214 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on May 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on May 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires that hospitals, physicians and other health professionals provide information about Down Syndrome and Down Syndrome resources and support groups to parents who have received a prenatal or postnatal diagnosis of Down Syndrome. The Department of Health and Social Services is tasked with collecting and distributing appropriate information to health care providers for distribution to parents. This bill will ensure that parents receiving a Down Syndrome diagnosis are timely provided accurate and complete information about Down Syndrome to help them in their planning process.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Information On Down Syndrome.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2014-01-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-01-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 6 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2013-06-27 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to Health & Human Development Committee |
2013-06-27 | House | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |