DE HB213 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of the Town of Elsmere and Title 21 of the Delaware Code to create a Voluntary Assessment Center and establish procedures governing the creation and operation of the Center.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Elsmere And Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To A Voluntary Assessment Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-24 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-23 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-17 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-17 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |