DE HB211 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill adds the Department of Correction, Bureau of Prisons and Bureau of Community Corrections' vehicles to the list of "authorized emergency vehicles" identified in Chapter 41 of Title 21 that are afforded certain privileges when responding to an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Emergency Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-30 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2021-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-06-29 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2021-06-03 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback