DE HB211 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases the tax on cigarettes from $1.15 to $1.60 per 20-cigarette pack. Section 1 increases the cigarette tax rate. Section 2 makes the cigarette tax effective for possession within the state after midnight July 31, 2009. It also imposes a “floor tax” on inventories of cigarettes and requires that the difference between the new tax and the old tax be paid on stamps purchased on or before midnight July 31, 2009, but not affixed to any cigarettes as of the effective date of this Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 53, Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Levy, Collection And Use Of Tobacco Product Tax Revenue.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Cook [D] | Sen. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Robert Gilligan [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] |
Sen. Gary Simpson [R] | Sen. Liane Sorenson [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-06-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 25 YES 15 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | Amendment HA 3 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 16 YES 23 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | Amendment HA 3 defeated | |
2009-06-29 | Amendment HA 3 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-29 | Lifted from Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-25 | Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-25 | Restored in House | |
2009-06-18 | Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 22 YES 17 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-18 | Amendment HA 2 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-18 | Amendment HA 2 defeated | |
2009-06-18 | Amendment HA 1 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-16 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-16 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-10 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 6 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable | |
2009-06-09 | Introduced in House and assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-06-09 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |