DE HB208 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Delaware Hazardous Substance Control Act to reflect recent amendments to the federal Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act (CERCLA). This Act protects state, county, and municipal government entities from being deemed liable as owners or operators of hazardous substance release sites when they take title to or control of such properties through the exercise of their lawful governmental powers.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Hazardous Substance Cleanup Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Rep. David Bentz [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-25 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |