DE HB208 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act renames the Division of Long Term Care Residents Protection to the Division of Health Care Quality and strengthens the Division's ability to protect Delawareans receiving long term, acute, or outpatient health care. The new name better describes the Division which now includes not only long term care, but also acute and outpatient care facilities and agencies.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Division Of Long Term Care Residents Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bentz [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] |
Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-01-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-01-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-29 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |