DE HB208 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Under Title 4, 514(h), motorsports speedways are allowed to permit patrons to bring their own alcoholic beverages with them for their own personal consumption. Right now, only Dover International Speedway meets the seating capacity identified in the Motorsports Speedway definition. This amendment will lower the seating capacity within the definition to allow other motorsport speedways, such as the Delaware International Speedway in Delmar, to qualify for this exception.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Alcoholic Liquors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 7 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-07-01 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-07-01 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2015-06-23 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |