DE HB205 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes a number of revisions to the Law-Enforcement Officers Bill of Rights in Title 11 of the Delaware Code. It adds part-time officers to the coverage of the chapter. It distinguishes between formal investigations and informal inquiries, but requires that even informal inquiries must comport with federal and State law, including NLRB v. J. Weingarten, Inc., 420 U.S. 251 (1975) and Garrity v. New Jersey, 385 U.S. 493 (1967).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Law Enforcement Officer Bill Of Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-07 Signed by Governor
2023-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2023-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2023-06-22 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2023-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2023-06-21 was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 205

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback