DE HB205 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act establishes the Delaware Expanding Access for Retirement and Necessary Saving (EARNS) program to serve as a vehicle through which eligible employees may, on a voluntary basis, provide for additional retirement security through a State-facilitated retirement savings program in a convenient, cost effective, and portable manner. The EARNS program will be designed to serve small businesses who are unable to offer retirement plans to employees due to the cost and administrative burden.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 19 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Establishment And Management Of The Expanding Access For Retirement And Necessary Saving Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2022-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2022-06-14 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2022-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2022-05-17 Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
2022-05-17 Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
2022-05-17 Amendment HA 3 to HB 205 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2022-05-17 Amendment HA 2 to HB 205 - Stricken in House
2022-05-17 Amendment HA 1 to HB 205 - Stricken in House
2022-03-22 Amendment HA 3 to HB 205 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2022-03-17 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2021-06-21 Amendment HA 2 to HB 205 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-11 Amendment HA 1 to HB 205 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-10 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2021-06-09 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-05-20 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback