DE HB205 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 10 YES 5 NO 2 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 10 YES 5 NO 2 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act authorizes a court to impose as a condition of bail that a person charged with misdemeanor Driving Under the Influence not be permitted to drive a vehicle. This Act also allows the Justice of the Peace Court to retain jurisdiction to impose, modify and enforce bail conditions for misdemeanor Driving Under the Influence offenders even after the case is transferred to the Court of Common Pleas for trial. This Act further authorizes the Justice of the Peace Court to impose bail conditions including abstinence from alcohol or drugs and monitoring necessary to ensure compliance with such condition.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Bail Conditions.
Sponsors
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
Rep. Stephen Smyk [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Defeated By Senate. Votes: 10 YES 5 NO 2 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT | |
2017-06-29 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2017-06-29 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2017-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-27 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |
2017-06-27 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 205 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 205 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-15 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 205 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-13 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 205 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |