DE HB205 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires that school districts schedule an in-service day for the day of any primary election in which district schools will be used as polling places. This bill also provides that the department of elections for each county may use public school buildings for primaries.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2013-06-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |