DE HB204 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes a number of changes to Chapter 21, Title 11 of the Delaware Code, with the goal of modernizing the pretrial process, reducing reliance on monetary conditions, improving the efficiency and outcomes for the criminal justice system, and ensuring the safety of the community. An analysis of data for pretrial detention and bail shows that Delawares bail system is failing in two ways: we unnecessarily detain individuals who lack funds for their release, and on the other end of the spectrum, we release defendants who fail to appear or remain law abiding during their period of pretrial release. The Courts, the Department of Correction, the Office of Defense Services, the Attorney Generals Offices, members of law enforcement and the private defense bar, and the Delaware Center for Justice have worked collaboratively to propose the changes embodied in this bill, and will continue to work on further revisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Release Of Persons Accused Of Crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-25 Signed by Governor
2018-01-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 NOT VOTING
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-27 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 NO
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 204 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to HB 204 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2017-06-07 Tabled in Committee
2017-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback