DE HB204 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows reconstructed vehicles that are more than 25 years old to be exempt from emissions testing. Biennial safety and anti-tampering inspections would still be required. These reconstructed vehicles are typically show cars that are only used for club activities, parades, and exhibits similar to antique vehicles. Antique vehicles are currently exempt from emissions and safety inspection.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Inspection Of Certain Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2013-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2013-06-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |