DE HB204 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill updates the responsibilities of the Office of the Auditor of Accounts. The Bill provides that the work papers of an investigation or investigatory audit conducted by the Auditor of Accounts shall not be deemed public records. The Bill removes from the Code a specific salary requirement for the Auditor of Accounts, providing instead that such salary shall be determined in accordance with the recommendation of the Delaware Compensation Commission and the line item appropriations of the General Assembly. The Bill also removes a specific salary requirement for the Deputy Auditor of Accounts.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Auditor Of Accounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. Darryl Scott [D] |
Sen. Robert Venables [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2012-06-12 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-01-25 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-21 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |