DE HB203 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act directs the Division of Medicaid and Medical Assistance, Division of Public Health, and Office of Management and Budget Human Resources Management (the Agencies) to report to the General Assembly every 2 years the impacts and costs associated with diabetes. The first report is due by June 30, 2019. The report shall include:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Diabetes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-14 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-30 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-27 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2017-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 12 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback