DE HB203 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act directs the Division of Medicaid and Medical Assistance, Division of Public Health, and Office of Management and Budget Human Resources Management (the Agencies) to report to the General Assembly every 2 years the impacts and costs associated with diabetes. The first report is due by June 30, 2019. The report shall include:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Diabetes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-27 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 12 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |