DE HB202 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Laid On Table in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill creates a pilot program for the Red Clay School District to utilize external camera systems on their school buses to catch motorists that illegally pass school buses and to punish these motorists by issuing them a civil penalty. The purpose of this bill is to protect children as they are in the process of boarding and exiting the school bus and to spread awareness of school bus traffic safety. At least 16 states have implemented similar legislation, including Pennsylvania in 2018. As Red Clay School District already has these cameras in operation, this program grants the authority to begin issuing violations to motorist that illegally pass school buses in their district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Red Clay Consolidated School District Bus Safety Camera Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Laid On Table in Senate
2019-07-01 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2019-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-06-30 Amendment HA 1 to HB 202 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-06-25 Amendment HA 1 to HB 202 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2019-06-11 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback