DE HB202 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act addresses new requirements on fingerprinting and criminal history reports from the Federal Bureau of Investigation and allows the Thoroughbred Racing Commission to continue its long standing practice of obtaining fingerprints and criminal history reports from the State Bureau of Information for individuals seeking to be licensed to participate in horse racing in Delaware.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Horse Racing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback