DE HB202 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-24 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-24 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill changes the requirements for security guard and private investigator licenses by (a) making the qualifications uniform for both occupations; (b) providing that a license may still be issued for persons convicted of 2 or less drug or theft-related misdemeanors, so long as the misdemeanors are more than 7 years old; and (c) disqualifying juveniles adjudicated delinquent of a felony level offense unless they are at least 25 years old.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Private Investigators And Private Security Agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2013-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2013-06-20 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |