DE HB201 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act clarifies that after a physician-patient relationship has been properly established in accordance with this section, subsequent communications and treatment may be conducted as the doctor and patient deem appropriate. As with all practice of medicine, such subsequent interactions must still meet the standard of care for the given field of medicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Telemedicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-23 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2017-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback