DE HB201 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-21 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-21 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act repeals the “bottle bill”, Subchapter III, Chapter 60 of Title 7 of the Delaware Code, in its entirety, effective September 1, 2010. The Act further requires that distributors provide dealers with notice of the effective date of the repeal and a public notice to be posted in retail locations from January 1, 2010, through September 30, 2010. The public notice shall inform consumers of the effective date of the repeal and the phone number and website of the respective county’s public works department and the phone number and website of the Delaware Solid Waste Authority single-stream curbside recycling program.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 60, Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Beverage Containers
Sponsors
Sen. Colin Bonini [R] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
Rep. Teresa Schooley [D] | Sen. Gary Simpson [R] | Rep. John Viola [D] | Rep. D.P. Williams [D] |
Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-21 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2009-07-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 6 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2009-06-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |