DE HB200 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-6)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Many of the States waters do not meet water quality standards to support their designated uses, such as for drinking, swimming or supporting aquatic life. The Clean Water for Delaware Act establishes a framework for assessing needs and planning and implementing projects that support Delawares efforts to improve the quality of the States water supply and waterways. A Delaware Clean Water Trust account is created as a funding source for executing projects highlighted by this framework.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Delaware Code Relating To Clean Water For Delaware.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-22 Signed by Governor
2021-06-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (Environment & Energy) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-04-01 Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee in Senate
2021-04-01 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-04-01 Amendment HA 2 to HB 200 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-04-01 Amendment HA 2 to HB 200 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-01-13 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 7 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2020-12-04 Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback