DE HB200 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill sets a minimum reimbursement rate for home health care nursing services paid for by Medicaid-contracted organizations. The rate shall be at least equal to the rate set by the Division of Medicaid for equivalent services. Home care nurses and aides give Delawareans with disabilities the option to remain at home with their families and prevents unnecessary use of higher-cost hospitals, nursing homes and rehabilitation facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Medicaid And Home Health Care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 2 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 200 - Stricken in House
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 2 to HB 200 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback