DE HB200 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - HS 1 for HB 200 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - HS 1 for HB 200 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds provisions to Title 21 defining accessible parking spaces, incorporating federal standards for accessible parking spaces found in the Americans with Disabilities Act and adding additional requirements that enhance these standards and better reflect the needs of persons with disabilities in Delaware. The Act increases the penalty associated with violating the statute that prohibits individuals who do not possess a parking placard or special license plate from parking in accessible parking spaces, or in the access aisles located next to accessible parking spaces. This Act adds provisions in Titles 9 and 22 of the Delaware Code to require county and municipal governments to adopt regulations and ordinances incorporating these requirements for accessible parking spaces, including the requirement that property owners have a permit and inspection for new or modified accessible parking spaces, in order to increase compliance and uniformity statewide.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 9, 21, And 22 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Accessible Parking Spaces.
Sponsors
Rep. John Viola [D] | Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] |
Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Rep. Sean Matthews [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | HS 1 for HB 200 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-03-24 | House | HS 1 for HB 200 - Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 On Its Merits |
2016-03-22 | House | HS 1 for HB 200 - Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security |
2016-03-22 | House | Substituted by HS 1 for HB 200 |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2015-06-17 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |