DE HB20 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires all public and charter schools which have students in grades 6-12 to provide free feminine hygiene products in 50% of the bathrooms used by students who can have a menstrual cycle. This bill also requires schools to publish on its website and post in its common areas the locations of the bathrooms where the hygiene products are provided. Finally, this bill provides that each school must consult with its school nurse regarding the products to be provided.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Provision Of Free Feminine Hygiene Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-03-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 Favorable | |
2021-03-24 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2021-03-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-18 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2021-03-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-03-18 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 20 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-03-15 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 20 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-01-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2020-12-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |