DE HB20 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act authorizes the Family Court to interview children who are involved in Protection From Abuse proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Child Interviews.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-07-01 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2017-03-28 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-03-23 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-03-23 Amendment HA 1 to HB 20 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-03-23 Amendment HA 1 to HB 20 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-01-18 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2017-01-05 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback