DE HB199 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The Board of Pension Trustees has established policies and practices for the administration of the Delaware Public Employees Retirement System. Based on the recommendations of the Boards Best Practices review, this Act will codify some of these policies and practices. The Act also indemnifies committee members and clarifies the frequency of Board meetings and authorized methods of communication for obtaining quorum and voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Pension Trustees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback