DE HB198 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill changes the term of each elected member of the Indian River school board from 3 years to 5 years. The 5-year terms will be added gradually upon the passage of this bill, as each elected member will start a 5-year term on July 1 following his or her election.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Indian River School Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-07-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2012-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |