DE HB196 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The Act places the Parents Right to Know Act in the Department of Education instead of the Department of Services for Children, Youth, and Their Families. This Act also clarifies the notice requirements.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 14 And 31 Relating To The Parents Right To Know Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-29 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-29 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 196 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-28 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 196 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-25 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 6 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |