DE HB196 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

House Bill No. 195 updates the terms and definitions used in Chapter 11 of Title 16 regarding long term care. This Act updates the terminology used to identify long term care facilities so that it is consistent throughout the Code. Specific updates are as follows:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 2, Title 11, Title 16, Title 18, Title 19, Title 24, And Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Long Term Care Facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14 Signed by Governor
2018-01-23 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-07-12 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2017-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-21 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback