DE HB195 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Re-Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jun 23 @ 1:00 pm Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

This Act requires certain police officers and some certain employees of the Department of Correction and Department of Services for Children, Youth, and Their Families to wear a body worn camera and to use the body worn camera to record interactions with a member of the public in accordance with the regulations to be established by the Council on Police Training. This Act requires state agencies to implement the statewide body worn camera program through the procurement of cameras, development of a central data storage program, and provision of necessary personnel as funding is available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Administration Of Body Worn Cameras.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17 Re-Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
2021-06-17 Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
2021-06-17 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-06-17 Amendment HA 2 to HB 195 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2021-06-11 Amendment HA 2 to HB 195 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-04 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2021-06-03 Amendment HA 1 to HB 195 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-05-17 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2021-05-12 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2021-05-06 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback