DE HB195 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of the Bill is to update the existing beekeeping code to better reflect current practices.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Rep. William Bush [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] |
Rep. Ronald Gray [R] | Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |