DE HB19 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill defines and regulates electric bicycles. Section 1 adds electric bicycles to the definitions contained in Title 21. Section 2 includes electric bicycle operators and passengers as vulnerable users when on a highway, crosswalk, road shoulder or sidewalk and prescribes rights and responsibilities attendant to the operation of electric bicycles. Section 3 adds electric bicycles to the definition of vehicle.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Electric Bicycles.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-30 | Amendment SA 2 to HB 19 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-30 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 19 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-30 | Amendment SA 2 to HB 19 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-05-18 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 19 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-04-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-01 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2021-04-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-04-01 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 19 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-03-29 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 19 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-03-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 7 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 19 - Stricken | |
2021-03-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 19 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2020-12-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |