DE HB19 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-05 - Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill is a follow-up to House Bill No. 432, a change to the Town of Elsmeres charter, passed in the 148th General Assembly. HB432 removed a cap on the amount of indebtedness the Town of Elsmere could incur to meet current expenses. This bill clarifies that such borrowing is intended to cover short term cash needs and shall not exceed anticipated revenue for the current fiscal year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Elsmere.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-05 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2017-01-18 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-01-19 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-01-19 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-03-16 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-04-13 Signed by Governor

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback